+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- to Small Business & Information Technology (H) posted in committee
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor