+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- To Health & Welfare (H)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House