+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
- 2nd reading
- Returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
- 1st reading
- Returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 4, 2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
- Posting waived
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reassigned to Banking & Insurance (H)
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- To Licensing & Occupations (H)
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS
Retain original provisions except delete behavior specialist and behavioral specialists from the list of protected titles and substitute a prohibition on indicating one is practicing behavior analysis if not licensed; delete language relating to the initial and subsequent boards and retain the language for the membership and terms of board members; delete the amendment to KRS 645.020, which added a board certified licensed behavior analyst to the definition of mental health professional" for purposes of the Juvenile Code, KRS Chapter 600; add a special effective date of September 15, 2014, for sections 5 to 11 of the Act, relating to registration of behavior technicians.