+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 23)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in House
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 87-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, Febrauary 26, 2016
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- To Appropriations & Revenue
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS1
Retain original provisions, except insert one additional claim.