+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Education (S)
- To Education (S)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-1
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- To Education (H)
- Introduced in House
On November 12, 2014 in the House:
- To: Interim Joint Committee on Education