+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 109)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) received in House to Rules (H) posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) passed 93-0 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- taken from State & Local Government (S) 1st reading returned to State & Local Government (S)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- to State & Local Government (S)
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-0
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- posted in committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- introduced in House