+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 119)
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in House
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 24, 2015
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- To Local Government (H)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS/LM
Make technical correction.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor