+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 66)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 34-0
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 24, 2022
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Education (S)
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 88-0 with Floor Amendment (1)
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- floor amendment (1) filed
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 24, 2022
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- to Local Government (H)
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On July 6, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).