+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 171)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- received in House to Rules (H) posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto vetoes overridden Bill passed 76-12 received in Senate to Rules (S) posted for consideration of Governor's veto for Monday, March 29, 2021 vetoes overridden Bill passed 28-5 received in House
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- line items vetoed
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 3rd reading floor amendments (1-title), (2), and (3) ruled out of order passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) received in House to Rules (H) taken from Rules posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute passed 94-0 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- floor amendments (1-title), (2), and (3) filed
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute 3rd reading, passed 91-4 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1), and committee amendment (1-title)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2021
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (H) posted in committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor