+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 15, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (2-title) posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 15, 2020 3rd reading Committee Substitute (1) withdrawn floor amendments (1) (2) and (3) withdrawn committee amendment (1-title) withdrawn passed 24-10 with Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (2-title) received in House to Rules (H) taken from Rules posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (2) and committee amendment (2-title)
On April 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) floor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 75-17 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 21, 2020
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- introduced in House to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On August 21, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor