+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 58)
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0
- Floor amendment (1) filed
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 82-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 2, 2018
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitutes (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- To Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (3)
SFA1
Amend HB 319/GA to clarify that definition of "veteran" conforms to United States Code.
HCA1
Make title amendment.
HCS1
Retain original provisions; require require the application for an occupational license to be complete before the 30 day issuance of an occupational license goes into effect; amend KRS 14A.1-070 to define "veteran" and "veteran-owned business"; create a new section of Subchapter 2 of KRS Chapter 14A to exempt a veteran-owned business from paying filing fees to the Secretary of State's office for filing various business documents; amend KRS 14A.2-060 to exempt a veteran-owned business from paying the filing fee for annual reports and amended annual reports for four years after the initial registration of the business.