+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 90-6
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 13, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- To Judiciary
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor