+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 202)
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- received in House to Rules (H) taken from Rules posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto veto overridden passed 73-22 received in Senate to Rules (S) posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto veto overridden passed 20-14
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- line items vetoed
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) received in House to Rules (H) posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) passed 92-0 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) taken from Rules placed in the Orders of the Day 3rd reading, passed 85-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) 2nd reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) 1st reading returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor