+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 8)
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 93-1
- House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Taken from Rules
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- To Rules
- Received in House
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 26, 2018
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with committee amendments (1) and (2-title)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 12, 2018
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendments (1) and (2-title)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Posting waived
- To Economic Development & Workforce Investment
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (3)
SCS1
Retain the original provisions except to clarify that if an administrative regulation is suspended or delayed then the preceding OSH administrative regulation may remain in place to correspond with the actions of the federal government. This authority to suspend extends to the secretary only if he or she is consistent with federal actions.
HCA2
Make title amendment.
HCA1
Delete original provisions; amend KRS 338.061 to give the Labor Cabinet secretary authority to suspend or delay administrative regulations based on the actions of the federal government relating to a corresponding federal regulation; EMERGENCY.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor