+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Health & Welfare (S)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 60-37 with floor amendment (1)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Floor amendment (1) filed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Taken from Rules
- Placed in the Orders of the Day
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- To Health & Welfare (H)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HFA (1, L. Bechler)
Delete original provisions; amend KRS 214.034 to require that information relating to immunization against human papillomavirus be mailed to parents of children entering the 6th grade and that schools make that information available via the Internet; require that a parent or guardian never be required to opt-out of a required vaccination of the HPV vaccine; require that a parent only be requested to opt-in to an HPV vaccine program; amend KRS 214.036 to permit parents to withhold consent for immunization against human papillomavirus for any reason.