+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken from Health & Welfare (S)
- 2nd reading
- Returned to Health & Welfare (S)
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken from Health & Welfare (S)
- 1st reading
- Returned to Health & Welfare (S)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Health & Welfare (S)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 61-31 with Committee Substitute
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Taken from Rules
- Placed in the Orders of the Day
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- To Health & Welfare (H)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS
Retain original provisions except amend KRS 217.920 to define a term; amend KRS 217.924 to exempt phototherapy devices when used or prescribed to be used by a physician; delete a subsection relating to minor consent forms.