+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 48-46
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, to Rules
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Posting waived
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- To Judiciary (H)
- Introduced in House