+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- to Judiciary (H)
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor