+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- To Local Government (H)
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor