+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 123)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate committee amendment (1-title) passed 88-0 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- posted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendment (1-title)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- received in House to Rules (H)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with committee amendment (1-title)
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with committee amendment (1-title)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Agriculture (S)
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 97-0
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2021
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- to Health & Family Services (H) posted in committee
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor