+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 085)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-2
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor
- Received in Senate
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 89-2
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- To Economic Development & Workforce Investment
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor