+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 18, 2016
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- To Health & Welfare
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS1
Retain original provisions except delete language specifying the exemption of private offices, clinics, and office buildings of advanced practice registered nurses from certificate of need.