+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 27, 2013
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- To Health & Welfare (H)
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HFA (1, J. Gooch Jr.)
Delete all sections of the bill; prohibit a ban on any food, beverage or container for food or beverage in the Commonwealth until the U.S. Food and Drug Administration bans it.
HFA (2/Title, J. Gooch Jr.)
Make title amendment.