+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor