+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Transportation (S)
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 67-29 with Committee Substitute
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 18, 2014
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- To Transportation (H)
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS
Retain original provisions, except permit vehicles to park on the side of state-maintained highways, shoulders, and ramps for a period not to exceed 15 minutes; permit vehicles to stop on the shoulders to the right of the traveled way during inclement weather conditions.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor