+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 117)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in House
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2013
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Transportation (S)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- To Transportation (H)
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House