+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 079)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) received in House to Rules (H) posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) passed 89-2 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- to State & Local Government (S)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0 received in Senate
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- to Local Government (H)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- introduced in House
On September 7, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).