+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 84-15
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2023
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)