+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- to State & Local Government (S)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 92-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2021
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- posted in committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H)
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)