+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 12)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from Judiciary (S)
- 1st reading
- Returned to Judiciary (S)
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary (S)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 66-29
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- To Judiciary (H)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor