+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Licensing & Occupations (S)
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 93-0 received in Senate
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2021
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) posted in committee
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
On August 20, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled by the sponsor(s).
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor