+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Education (S)
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 80-18
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 12, 2015
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Posted in committee
- To Education (H)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House