+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- To Agriculture & Small Business
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor