+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government (S)
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-1
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 21, 2014
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- To State Government (H)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor