+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
- Received in House
- Veto overriden in House 71-8
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Vetoed
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in House
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate committee title amendment withdrawn
- Senate Committee Substitute withdrawn
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0
- Floor amendments (1) and (2-title) withdrawn
- Taken from the Orders of the Day
- Placed in the Consent Orders #1
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On March 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed
- Passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2016
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1), committee amendment (1-title)
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 16, 2016
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- To Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (5)
SFA1
Amend KRS 161.048 to allow a veteran with a bachelor's degree in any area to be issued a provisional teaching certificate, if other criteria are met; clarify the discharge evidence provisions; require academic content knowledge to be aligned with the offer of employment.
SFA2
Make title amendment.
SCA1
Make title amendment.
SCS1
Retain original provisions; amend KRS 40.315 to allow for the interment of eligible veterans at state veterans' cemeteries.
HCS1
Clarify that military training and experience cannot be substituted for the acquisition of a college degree or passage of a specific examination when either is a prerequisite for licensure or certification.