+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Floor amendment (3) and (4-title) filed
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Floor amendment (1) and (2-title) filed
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 29, 2016
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- To Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (4)
HFA4
Make title amendment.
HFA3
Amend KRS 117.075 and 117.085 to allow voters who on account of age, disability, or illness are not able to appear at the polls on election day to cast an absentee ballot on those days in-person absentee voting is conducted in the county clerk's office or other designated place.
HFA2
Make title amendment.
HFA1
Amend KRS 117.075 to make qualified voters over age 65 automatically eligible to cast an absentee ballot.