+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 87)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Received in House
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013
- Reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Judiciary (S)
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Judiciary (S)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from Judiciary (S)
- 1st reading
- Returned to Judiciary (S)
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary (S)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 93-0
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reassigned to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- To Judiciary (H)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor