+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (2-title) filed to bill
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Health & Welfare (S)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- to Health & Family Services (H) posted in committee
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor