+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government (S)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-1
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 17, 2015
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- To Local Government (H)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House