+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 130)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 30-3 received in House
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, to Rules
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Judiciary (S) 2nd reading returned to Judiciary (S)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- taken from Judiciary (S) 1st reading returned to Judiciary (S)
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- to Judiciary (S)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- received in Senate to Committee on Committees (S)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 82-12 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 08, 2022
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- to Judiciary (H)
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor