+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 144)
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 35-3
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 99-0
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2017
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor