+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (55)
- Delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 209)
- Placed in the Orders of the Day for Friday, April 14, 2018
- Taken from Rules
- To Rules
- Returned to Rules
- Received in House
- Line items vetoed
- Free Conference Committee report filed in House
- Free Conference Committee report filed in Senate
- Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
- Bill passed 35-3
- Received in House
- To Rules
- Free Conference Committee report adopted in House
- Taken from Rules
- Posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
- Bill passed 81-9
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
- Delivered to Governor
- Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
- Conference Committee report adopted in House
- Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
- Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate
- Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
- Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1)
- Posted for passage for receding from Senate for Thursday, March 22, 2018
- To Rules
- Received in House
- Received in Senate
- Taken from Rules
- Posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
- House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute
- 3rd reading, passed 26-12 with Committee Substitute (1)
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018
- Reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
- Returned to Appropriations & Revenue
- 2nd reading
- Taken from Appropriations & Revenue
- Returned to Appropriations & Revenue
- 1st reading
- Taken from Appropriations & Revenue
- To Appropriations & Revenue
- Received in Senate
- 3rd reading, passed 84-8 with Committee Substitute
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 1, 2018
- Taken from Rules
- 2nd reading, to Rules
- Reported favorably with Committee Substitute
- Posted in committee
- Returned to Appropriations & Revenue
- 1st reading
- Taken from Appropriations & Revenue
- To Appropriations & Revenue
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (4)
FCCR1
Retain provisions with the following exceptions: amend appropriations as follows: appropriate $422,023,400 in fiscal year 2018-2019 and $424,951,600 in fiscal year 2019-2020 from the General Fund, Restricted Funds, and Federal Funds; amend County Employees Retirement System excess savings provision to include non-elected personnel; insert Circuit Clerk expense allowance provision; provide actuarial-assessed judicial retirement benefits; insert deferred funding provision; insert capital projects for Bath, Oldham, and Jefferson Counties; direct unexpended use allowance moneys to the Budget Reserve Trust Fund; reduce funds transfers; exempt constitutional duties, bond payments, and use allowance from the Budget Reduction Expenditure Plan.
CCR1
Do not agree.
SCS1
Retain original provisions with the following exceptions: amend appropriations as follows: appropriate $413,220,100 in fiscal year 2018-2019 and $416,148,300 in fiscal year 2019-2020 from the General Fund, Restricted Funds, and Federal Funds; remove Supreme Court Renovations provision; insert County Employees Retirement System Excess Savings provision; remove Judicial Retirement Benefits provision and provide no funding for the actuarially required contributions to the Judicial Retirement Plan; remove Deferred Funding provision; remove capital projects except leases; remove Unexpended Use Allowance provision.
HCS1
Retain original provisions with the following exceptions: amend appropriations as follows: appropriate $421,952,400 in fiscal year 2018-2019 and $424,880,600 in fiscal year 2019-2020 from the General Fund, Restricted Funds, and Federal Funds; remove pay equity initiative provision; remove replacement of Federal Funds provision; insert civil filing fees - non-elected personnel provision; insert night court in Jefferson County provision; provide Restricted Funds for Supreme Court renovations; remove local facility assessments provision; remove increased CERS rates on janitorial and maintenance staff in judicial centers and courthouses provision; provide General Fund moneys for lease in Madison County; stipulate that no pension benefit increase is granted to recipients of a retirement allowance under KRS 21.345 to 21.580 on July 1, 2018, or July 1, 2019; insert administrative expenses provision; provide for authorization of capital projects; insert Capital Projects and Bond Oversight Committee provision; amend Local Facilities Use Allowance Contingency Fund provision; defer General Fund support for operating costs, annualized use allowance payments, and nonrecurring furniture and equipment costs for Oldham County to the 2020-2022 fiscal biennium; remove carry forward of Restricted and Federal Funds provision; amend maximum salary of Trial Commissioners provision; insert authorized personnel complement provision; insert unexpended use allowance provision; insert debt restructuring provision; insert funds transfer.