+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 145)
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Agriculture
- Received in Senate
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute
- Taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- To Agriculture
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS1
Retain original provisions of the bill; refine requirements for a person who is convicted or pleads guilty to equine cruelty to require restitution for property damage and costs of care or termination of possession of the equine.