+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 021)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 5, 2019 3rd reading, passed 37-0
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 99-0
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- posted in committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- introduced in House