+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Transportation (S)
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 65-32
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed in the Orders of the Day
- Taken from Rules
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- To Transportation (H)
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House