+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- signed by Governor Acts Ch. 42)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 36-0 received in House enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House enrolled, signed by President of the Senate delivered to Governor
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) 1st reading returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- received in Senate
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 92-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2021
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- to Small Business & Information Technology (H) posted in committee
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- introduced in House to Committee on Committees (H)