+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 57)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
- Passed 97-0
- House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Taken from Rules
- To Rules (H)
- Received in House
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013
- Reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taken from Education (S)
- 2nd reading
- Returned to Education (S)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Education (S)
- 1st reading
- Taken from Education (S)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Education (S)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-1
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
- To Education (H)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
SCS
Retain original provisions except delete requirements for early childhood program assessments and the identification of a screening tool for entry into kindergarten.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor