+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 121)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0-1
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 27, 2014
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to State & Local Government (S)
- 2nd reading
- Taken from State & Local Government (S)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken from State & Local Government (S)
- Returned to State & Local Government (S)
- 1st reading
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To State & Local Government (S)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 94-1
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 10, 2014
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- To Local Government (H)
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor