+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 34)
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received in House
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 37-0
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 5, 2013
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- To Transportation (S)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 95-0
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2013
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- To Transportation (H)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced in House