+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 84)
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
- Received in House
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3rd reading, passed 34-3
- Posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- 3rd reading, passed 59-36 with Committee Substitute
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 8, 2018
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- 2nd reading, to Rules
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Posted in committee
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- To Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
HCS1
Delete original provisions; amend KRS 238.5354 to allow organizations that do not qualify under tax exempt requirements for charitable organizations to hold limited raffles; allow 501(c)(7) organizations to hold a special event raffle license to conduct up to 12 raffles per year with gross receipts of no more than $500,000; require all net receipts resulting from the raffle to be donated to a tax exempt charitable organization licensed by the department; establish information requirements to be submitted with application.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor